NY A08218 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - print number 8218a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - print number 8218a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a personal income tax credit for taxpayers who donate blood to a blood bank four or more times in a year
Title
Establishes a personal income tax credit for taxpayers who donate blood to a blood bank four or more times in a year; specifies such tax credit to be five hundred dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | print number 8218a | |
2010-04-21 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-07 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S6243 (Same As) 2010-04-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6243A