NY A08208 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on food insecurity at public and private higher education institutions.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of education to conduct a study on food insecurity at public and private higher education institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-10-27 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2021-08-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08169 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES