NY A08169 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to consumer protection from deceptive acts and practices; increases damages and directs consumers on bringing an action for such deceptive acts and practices.
Title
Relates to consumer protection from deceptive acts and practices; increases damages and directs consumers on bringing an action for such deceptive acts and practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |