NY A08142 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - print number 8142a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - print number 8142a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the provision of at least a 5 year warranty on electronic medical devices and implantable hip and knee medical devices.
Title
Requires the provision of at least a 5 year warranty on electronic medical devices and implantable hip and knee medical devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Assembly | print number 8142a |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05566 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES