NY S05566 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the provision of at least a 5 year warranty on electronic medical devices and implantable hip and knee medical devices.
Title
Requires the provision of at least a 5 year warranty on electronic medical devices and implantable hip and knee medical devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1768 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5566A |
2016-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08142 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - print number 8142a