NY A08016 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits members of the state police, police officers, and peace officers from intentionally covering their badges.
Title
Prohibits members of the state police, police officers, and peace officers from intentionally covering their badges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03701 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE