NY S03701 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits members of the state police, police officers, and peace officers from intentionally covering their badges.
Title
Prohibits members of the state police, police officers, and peace officers from intentionally covering their badges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08016 (Same As) 2021-09-15 - enacting clause stricken
A10721 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - referred to codes
A10721 (Same As) 2022-09-09 - referred to codes