NY A08001 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to management of scup.
Title
Relates to management of scup.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4873 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.436 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.436 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |