NY A07919 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6448a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6448a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jessica Strizzi.
Title
Grants retroactive Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jessica Strizzi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6448a |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.515 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | print number 7919a |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2017-05-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06448 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.200