NY A07904 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that not more than thirty per centum of the assets of any fund of the public retirement system shall be invested in foreign equities.
Title
Provides that not more than thirty per centum of the assets of any fund of the public retirement system shall be invested in foreign equities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7904a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05414 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental employees