NY A07899 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - signed chap.79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the appointment of a standby guardian due to administrative separation; defines administrative separation and the process for such appointment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the appointment of a standby guardian due to administrative separation; defines administrative separation and the process for such appointment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27Senatesigned chap.79
2018-06-25Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.595
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6217A
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.559
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.613
2017-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.613
2017-06-20Assemblyreported
2017-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-19Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-06-12Assemblyprint number 7899a
2017-06-12Assemblyamend and recommit to judiciary
2017-05-18Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06217 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7899A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07899
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07899A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07899&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7899#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback