NY A07839 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding additional chemicals to the list of emerging contaminants; directs the commissioner of health to establish the first list within 30 days.
Title
Relates to adding additional chemicals to the list of emerging contaminants; directs the commissioner of health to establish the first list within 30 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.359 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06625 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH