NY A07833 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the calculation of nonpublic schools' eligibility to receive aid.
Title
Relates to the calculation of nonpublic schools' eligibility to receive aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s6089 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.680 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06089 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.236