NY S06089 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.236
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the calculation of nonpublic schools' eligibility to receive aid.
Title
Relates to the calculation of nonpublic schools' eligibility to receive aid.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Marcellino [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.236 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.680 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7833 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2058 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07833 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6089