NY A07812 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of opioid antagonists by persons or entities for opioid overdose prevention; defines "entity".
Title
Authorizes the use of opioid antagonists by persons or entities for opioid overdose prevention; defines "entity".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.148 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.853 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8259 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.429 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | print number 7812a |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to health |