NY A07809 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing state funding for the fees and costs associated with providing electronic benefit transfer technology at farmers' markets.
Title
Relates to providing state funding for the fees and costs associated with providing electronic benefit transfer technology at farmers' markets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S03034 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE