NY A07798 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-4)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rates of payment for certified home health agencies.
Title
Relates to rates of payment for certified home health agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | print number 7798a |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05915 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5915A