NY A07785 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing counties to prohibit hunting during a seven-day special late bow, special long bow and muzzle loader season in the southern zone.
Title
Relates to allowing counties to prohibit hunting during a seven-day special late bow, special long bow and muzzle loader season in the southern zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6510 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.627 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.627 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06510 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.124