NY A07784 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions for payment to certain parole officers employed by the department of corrections and community supervision for salary and medical expenses while subject to sickness.
Title
Makes provisions for payment to certain parole officers employed by the department of corrections and community supervision for salary and medical expenses while subject to sickness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.239 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1902 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5762 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.336 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.336 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05762 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7784