NY A07767 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4472d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4472d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York achieving a better life experience (NY ABLE) savings account act to support individuals with disabilities to maintain health, independence and quality of life.
Title
Establishes the New York achieving a better life experience (NY ABLE) savings account act to support individuals with disabilities to maintain health, independence and quality of life.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Guillermo Linares [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Michelle Schimel [D] |
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4472d |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.679 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7767b |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7767a |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S04472 (Same As) 2015-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.30