NY A07726 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5929a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5929a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a child care availability taskforce to evaluate the need for and availability of child care throughout the state and requires such taskforce to report on its findings and recommendations annually.
Title
Establishes a child care availability taskforce to evaluate the need for and availability of child care throughout the state and requires such taskforce to report on its findings and recommendations annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s5929a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.245 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.245 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | print number 7726a |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05929 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.59