NY S05929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a child care availability taskforce to evaluate the need for and availability of child care throughout the state and requires such taskforce to report on its findings and recommendations annually.
Title
Establishes a child care availability taskforce to evaluate the need for and availability of child care throughout the state and requires such taskforce to report on its findings and recommendations annually.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.59 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.493 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.245 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a7726a |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1656 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5929A |
2017-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07726 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5929a