NY A07719 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s7185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the construction of single-family modular and manufactured housing purchased and sited on land owned by banks.
Title
Relates to the construction of single-family modular and manufactured housing purchased and sited on land owned by banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7185 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.623 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.623 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07185 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.44