NY A07707 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows bids for contracts from the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan commuter transportation authority to be received by such authorities through an electronic bidding platform and electronically posted for public view.
Title
Allows bids for contracts from the New York city transit authority and the metropolitan commuter transportation authority to be received by such authorities through an electronic bidding platform and electronically posted for public view.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Assembly | signed chap.267 |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1728 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6995A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.504 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.504 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7707a |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06995 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7707A