NY A07706 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - print number 7706a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - print number 7706a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain out of home services such as transition from a hospital, nursing facility or other institutional setting to the home within home care insurance coverage.
Title
Includes certain out of home services such as transition from a hospital, nursing facility or other institutional setting to the home within home care insurance coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Assembly | print number 7706a |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05076 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5076A