NY A07678 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary thresholds for the crimes of grand larceny, theft of services, and securities fraud.
Title
Increases the monetary thresholds for the crimes of grand larceny, theft of services, and securities fraud.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.453 |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |