NY A07637 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - approval memo.72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes additional supervision and regulation of limited-profit housing companies relating to requiring members of a board of directors of a limited-profit housing company to complete training regarding the financial oversight, accountability and fiduciary responsibilities of a board member and the powers, functions and duties of a board of directors of a limited-profit housing company.
Title
Authorizes additional supervision and regulation of limited-profit housing companies relating to requiring members of a board of directors of a limited-profit housing company to complete training regarding the financial oversight, accountability and fiduciary responsibilities of a board member and the powers, functions and duties of a board of directors of a limited-profit housing company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.72 |
2021-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.684 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1731 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7079 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.490 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.490 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07079 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7637