NY A07623 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the treatment of non-respondent parents in child protective, destitute child and permanency proceedings in family court.
Title
Relates to the treatment of non-respondent parents in child protective, destitute child and permanency proceedings in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.372 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.368 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.368 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05203 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES