NY A07603 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - print number 7603a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - print number 7603a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to participation in World Trade Center rescue, recovery and cleanup operations by members of the organized militia; provides that members of the organized militia shall qualify as employees for the purposes of making a claim under the workers' compensation law for participation in the World Trade Center rescue, recovery and cleanup operations.
Title
Relates to participation in World Trade Center rescue, recovery and cleanup operations by members of the organized militia; provides that members of the organized militia shall qualify as employees for the purposes of making a claim under the workers' compensation law for participation in the World Trade Center rescue, recovery and cleanup operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Assembly | print number 7603a |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06602 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE