NY A07601 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.532
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.532
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to membership dues in an employee organization and signed authorizations for deduction.
Title
Relates to membership dues in an employee organization and signed authorizations for deduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.532 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7601a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.560 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05778 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES