NY A07597 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.872
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.872
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Troy to impose hotel and motel taxes; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes the city of Troy to impose hotel and motel taxes; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.872 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.302 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.302 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05848 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS