NY A07562 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the development, adoption and implementation of a master plan for the Nissequogue River State Park.
Title
Requires the development, adoption and implementation of a master plan for the Nissequogue River State Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.260 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.397 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7562a |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2854B |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | AMENDED (T) 2854A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1031 |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s2854b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.397 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.397 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7562a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S02854 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260