NY S02854 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the development, adoption and implementation of a master plan for the Nissequogue River State Park.
Title
Requires the development, adoption and implementation of a master plan for the Nissequogue River State Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.260 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.397 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7562a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2854B |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2854A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1031 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05846 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
A07562 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260
A07562 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.260