NY A07536 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4516c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4516c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the falsification of COVID-19 vaccination records a crime as part of computer tampering in the third degree which is a class E felony.
Title
Makes the falsification of COVID-19 vaccination records a crime as part of computer tampering in the third degree which is a class E felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4516c |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7536b |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7536a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.260 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |