NY S04516 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.139
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the falsification of COVID-19 vaccination records a crime as part of computer tampering in the third degree which is a class E felony.
Title
Makes the falsification of COVID-19 vaccination records a crime as part of computer tampering in the third degree which is a class E felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.139 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.784 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.260 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7536b |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4516C |
2021-06-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1336 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4516B |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4516A |
2021-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2021-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |