NY A07510 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - signed chap.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - signed chap.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the effectiveness of powers of the chairman and members of the authority.
Title
Relates to extending the effectiveness of powers of the chairman and members of the authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | signed chap.78 |
2015-07-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4875 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.510 |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04875 (Same As) 2015-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7510