NY A07509 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the limit on certain investments.
Title
Increases the limit on certain investments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.455 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5299 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.283 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.283 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05299 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7509