NY A07505 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits alcohol sales to persons inside of motor vehicles unless the licensee is specifically authorized to do so.
Title
Prohibits alcohol sales to persons inside of motor vehicles unless the licensee is specifically authorized to do so.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04353 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - referred to economic development