NY A07502 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - substituted by s8976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - substituted by s8976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to award to victims of certain crimes.
Title
Relates to award to victims of certain crimes.
Sponsors
Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | substituted by s8976 |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.248 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.381 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.381 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08976 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.343