NY S08976 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.343
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to award to victims of certain crimes.
Title
Relates to award to victims of certain crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.343 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.248 |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7502 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1146 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07502 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - substituted by s8976