NY A07496 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to procurement contracts awarded by the Roswell Park Cancer Institute corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to procurement contracts awarded by the Roswell Park Cancer Institute corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1561
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5604A
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.173
2019-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.173
2019-06-12Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-03Assemblyprint number 7496a
2019-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-05-07Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S05604 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7496A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07496&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07496&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07496
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07496&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07496A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07496&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07496&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07496&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7496#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback