NY A07496 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to procurement contracts awarded by the Roswell Park Cancer Institute corporation.
Title
Relates to procurement contracts awarded by the Roswell Park Cancer Institute corporation.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.583 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1561 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5604A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.173 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7496a |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05604 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - signed chap.583