NY A07480 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - amended on third reading 7480a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - amended on third reading 7480a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the representation of newly formed political parties; relates to the placement of candidates of newly formed political parties on ballots, the representation of such parties within the state and the transmission of the official canvass of votes cast for presidential electors.
Title
Relates to the representation of newly formed political parties; relates to the placement of candidates of newly formed political parties on ballots, the representation of such parties within the state and the transmission of the official canvass of votes cast for presidential electors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7480a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.244 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.247 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.247 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06856 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS