NY A07418 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the hotel and motel tax in the town of Woodbury an additional three years.
Title
Extends the hotel and motel tax in the town of Woodbury an additional three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.699 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.506 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5191 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.441 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05191 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.699