NY A07401 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reciprocity of debarments imposed under the federal Davis-Bacon Act; provides that any contractor who has been debarred from federal job sites for having disregarded obligations to employees under the Davis-Bacon Act shall also be debarred under the labor law from bidding on or being awarded similar contracts on public work job sites sponsored by the state or any of its political subdivisions; provides that the contractor may appeal such a determination to the department of labor; provides that whether or not a contractor is debarred under the Davis-Bacon Act will be considered in the selection of a lowest responsible bidder.
Title
Relates to reciprocity of debarments imposed under the federal Davis-Bacon Act; provides that any contractor who has been debarred from federal job sites for having disregarded obligations to employees under the Davis-Bacon Act shall also be debarred under the labor law from bidding on or being awarded similar contracts on public work job sites sponsored by the state or any of its political subdivisions; provides that the contractor may appeal such a determination to the department of labor; provides that whether or not a contractor is debarred under the Davis-Bacon Act will be considered in the selection of a lowest responsible bidder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7401b |
2012-03-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.407 |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-02-23 | Assembly | print number 7401a |
2012-02-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | committed to labor |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.246 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.280 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05659 (Same As) 2012-08-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5659C