NY S00505 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the health department's review of correctional health services by including a biennial study of health care staffing at facilities operated by the department of corrections and community supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the health department's review of correctional health services by including a biennial study of health care staffing at facilities operated by the department of corrections and community supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06Assemblyreferred to health
2024-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.989
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2023-02-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback