NY A07356 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of rates of payment and delivery of health care services; directs the chair of the workers' compensation board to biennially prepare and establish a schedule of fees.
Title
Relates to the establishment of rates of payment and delivery of health care services; directs the chair of the workers' compensation board to biennially prepare and establish a schedule of fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.242 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.228 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-02 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05090 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LABOR