NY A07318 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4896a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to the Ossining urban renewal agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions relating to the Ossining urban renewal agency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s4896a
2015-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.560
2015-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.560
2015-06-17Assemblyreported
2015-06-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-06-15Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2015-05-11Assemblyprint number 7318a
2015-05-11Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2015-05-05Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S04896 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback