NY S04896 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the Ossining urban renewal agency.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to the Ossining urban renewal agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.488 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.560 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7318a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4896A |
2015-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07318 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4896a