NY A07309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an open primary system for all state and congressional elections.
Title
Establishes an open primary system for all state and congressional elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | print number 7309a |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | referred to election law |